THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:01:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-9051
Fax: (416) 438-9899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward G. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davies (CPSO#: 62451 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Suite 302
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-9051
Business Address: Boniface Park Cardiac Diagnostic Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-9051
Fax: (416) 438-9899

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward G. Davies Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davies (CPSO#: 62451 )
Business Address: Rouge Valley - Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Suite 302
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 438-9051
Business Address: Boniface Park Cardiac Diagnostic Centre
Unit 6
700 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A7
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD GEORGE DAVIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990