THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:13:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 499-3559
Fax: (416) 499-4631
Address: 316-701 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 0B2
Phone: 4163091980
Fax: 4163091980
Address: G18a-4168 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 5H6
Phone: 4162935940
Fax: 4162936036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MWC Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang (CPSO#: 62462 )
Business Address: Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
(416) 499-3559
Business Address: Suite LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-5940
Business Address: 701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 316
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Z3
416-613-8678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Suite 100
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 499-3559
Fax: (416) 499-4631
Address: 316-701 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 0B2
Phone: 4163091980
Fax: 4163091980
Address: G18a-4168 Finch Ave E
Scarborough ON M1S 5H6
Phone: 4162935940
Fax: 4162936036

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MWC Huang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Huang (CPSO#: 62462 )
Business Address: Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York Ontario M2J 2Z1
(416) 499-3559
Business Address: Suite LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1S 4T7
(416) 293-5940
Business Address: 701 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 316
Toronto Ontario M2K 2Z3
416-613-8678

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELINE WAN CHENG HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MADELINE WAN CHENG HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990