THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:26:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82538
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karpinski Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Karpinski (CPSO#: 62470 ) Dr. R. Klaassen (CPSO#: 62471 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital- Riverside Site
5th Floor, 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2210

Corporation Name: R. J. Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Site
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Extension: 82538
Fax: (613) 738-8337

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karpinski Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Karpinski (CPSO#: 62470 ) Dr. R. Klaassen (CPSO#: 62471 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital- Riverside Site
5th Floor, 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2210

Corporation Name: R. J. Klaassen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOLANTA ANNA MARIA KARPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARPINSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOLANTA ANNA MARIA KARPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990