THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:31:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville FHT-Central Site
101 Queensway West Ste 500
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Park (CPSO#: 62488 )
Business Address: Summerville FHT-Central Site
Suite 500
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-9700

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Summerville FHT-Central Site
101 Queensway West Ste 500
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 272-9700
Fax: (905) 272-1416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Aug 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Park (CPSO#: 62488 )
Business Address: Summerville FHT-Central Site
Suite 500
101 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
(905) 272-9700

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINCENT PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990