THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 09:16:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2367 Finch Ave. West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 744-8510
Fax: 416-744-7642

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safieh Kosar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kosar (CPSO#: 62530 ) Dr. P. Safieh (CPSO#: 62499 )
Business Address: 2367 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2367 Finch Ave. West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 744-8510
Fax: 416-744-7642

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safieh Kosar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kosar (CPSO#: 62530 ) Dr. P. Safieh (CPSO#: 62499 )
Business Address: 2367 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M9M 2W8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK SAFIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK SAFIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFIEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990