THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:11:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 71B WILLOW STREET
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 238-6818
Fax: (613) 238-1638

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo (CPSO#: 62521 )
Business Address: 71B Willow Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6V9
(613) 238-6818

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 71B WILLOW STREET
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 238-6818
Fax: (613) 238-1638

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Lo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lo (CPSO#: 62521 )
Business Address: 71B Willow Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6V9
(613) 238-6818

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY CHE KIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY CHE KIT LO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990