THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
6th floor, OPG, Room 913
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Address: Opg Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Suite 6-913
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Laframboise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laframboise (CPSO#: 62525 )
Business Address: OPG 700 University Avenue
Suite 6-913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 946-2254

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
6th floor, OPG, Room 913
700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288
Address: Opg Princess Margaret Cancer Center
Suite 6-913
700 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Phone: (416) 946-2254
Fax: (416) 946-2288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephane Laframboise Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laframboise (CPSO#: 62525 )
Business Address: OPG 700 University Avenue
Suite 6-913
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X6
(416) 946-2254

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE LAFRAMBOISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRAMBOISE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEPHANE LAFRAMBOISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAFRAMBOISE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990