THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Finch Ave W
suite 407
North York ON M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167412456
Fax: 4167412454
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416)242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Kreidstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kreidstein (CPSO#: 62528 )
Business Address: 502 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 743-6372
Business Address: 2115 Finch Ave W
suite 405
North York ON M3N 2V6
4167412456

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Finch Ave W
suite 407
North York ON M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167412456
Fax: 4167412454
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: (416)242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Kreidstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kreidstein (CPSO#: 62528 )
Business Address: 502 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Downsview Ontario M3N 2V7
(416) 743-6372
Business Address: 2115 Finch Ave W
suite 405
North York ON M3N 2V6
4167412456

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON HELENE KREIDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREIDSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON HELENE KREIDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREIDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990