THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:27:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rm B2-450
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
Box 5010
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8394
Fax: (519) 685-8024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kirby (CPSO#: 62534 )
Business Address: Suite B2-450
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8394

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rm B2-450
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
Box 5010
London Health Sciences Centre
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8394
Fax: (519) 685-8024

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joanne Kirby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kirby (CPSO#: 62534 )
Business Address: Suite B2-450
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8394

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE NAOMI KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOANNE NAOMI KIRBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRBY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990