THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:41:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-7722
Fax: 905-232-0674
Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
MississaugaRetina Institute
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Phone: 9052327722
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond Street
7th floor Donnelly wing
Toronto Ontario M5B1W8
Phone: 4168677422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Bradley Kates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kates (CPSO#: 62538 )
Business Address: 61 Queen Street East
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: 304 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 842-3555
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
9052327722

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-232-7722
Fax: 905-232-0674
Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
MississaugaRetina Institute
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
Phone: 9052327722
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 30 Bond Street
7th floor Donnelly wing
Toronto Ontario M5B1W8
Phone: 4168677422
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Bradley Kates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kates (CPSO#: 62538 )
Business Address: 61 Queen Street East
8th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 2T2
(416) 867-7422
Business Address: 304 - 1235 Trafalgar Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 3P1
(905) 842-3555
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: 415-1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E
Mississauga ON L4X 2Z9
9052327722

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARREN BRADLEY KATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WARREN BRADLEY KATES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990