THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Scottsdale Dr
Suite 302
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198371421
Fax: 5197672262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR KYRIE LITTLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Little (CPSO#: 62580 )
Business Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Suite 302
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
5198371421
Business Address: 208-55 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 7T8
5198372283

Corporation Name: Dr. Kyrie Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 649 Scottsdale Dr
Suite 302
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5198371421
Fax: 5197672262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2004
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR KYRIE LITTLE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Little (CPSO#: 62580 )
Business Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Suite 302
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
5198371421
Business Address: 208-55 Wyndham St N
Guelph ON N1H 7T8
5198372283

Corporation Name: Dr. Kyrie Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYRIE ANNE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYRIE ANNE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990