THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:42:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Orthopaedic Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137149449
Fax: 6137149456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. White (CPSO#: 62583 )
Business Address: Wesley Clover
390 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 0G7
(613) 271-6305
Business Address: Focus Assessments
Suite 150
1150 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8S9
(613) 721-4112
Business Address: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Orthopaedic Centre
1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
613-714-9449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Orthopaedic Centre
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137149449
Fax: 6137149456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Margaret White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. White (CPSO#: 62583 )
Business Address: Wesley Clover
390 March Road
Ottawa Ontario K2K 0G7
(613) 271-6305
Business Address: Focus Assessments
Suite 150
1150 Morrison Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8S9
(613) 721-4112
Business Address: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Orthopaedic Centre
1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
613-714-9449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990