THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samieh Chavoshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chavoshi (CPSO#: 62585 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samieh Chavoshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chavoshi (CPSO#: 62585 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIEH CHAVOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAVOSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIEH CHAVOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAVOSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990