THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-649 Scottsdale Dr
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-837-2283
Fax: 519-767-2262
Address: 160 Chancellors Way
Wellington Dufferin Public Health
Guelph ON N1G 0E1
Phone: 519-837-2283
Fax: 519-767-2262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol A. Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thomson (CPSO#: 62588 )
Business Address: 302-649 Scottsdale Dr
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
519-837-2283
Business Address: 160 Chancellors Way
Wellington Dufferin Public Health
Guelph ON N1G 0E1
519-837-2283

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-649 Scottsdale Dr
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-837-2283
Fax: 519-767-2262
Address: 160 Chancellors Way
Wellington Dufferin Public Health
Guelph ON N1G 0E1
Phone: 519-837-2283
Fax: 519-767-2262

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Homewood Health Centre
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol A. Thomson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thomson (CPSO#: 62588 )
Business Address: 302-649 Scottsdale Dr
Guelph ON N1G 4T7
519-837-2283
Business Address: 160 Chancellors Way
Wellington Dufferin Public Health
Guelph ON N1G 0E1
519-837-2283

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL ANN THOMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990