THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Main Street Markham North
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gannage (CPSO#: 62612 )
Business Address: 300 Main Street North
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y8
(905) 294-2335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 Main Street Markham North
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2335
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Gannage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gannage (CPSO#: 62612 )
Business Address: 300 Main Street North
Ground Floor
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y8
(905) 294-2335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL GANNAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GANNAGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990