THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.O.Box 247
Fonthill Ontario L0S1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-529-0253
Fax: 289-275-1003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safranyos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Safranyos (CPSO#: 62619 )
Business Address: 205 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 682-9335
Business Address: PO Box 247
Fonthill ON L0S 1E0
9058926963

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P.O.Box 247
Fonthill Ontario L0S1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-529-0253
Fax: 289-275-1003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Safranyos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Safranyos (CPSO#: 62619 )
Business Address: 205 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8
(905) 682-9335
Business Address: PO Box 247
Fonthill ON L0S 1E0
9058926963

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GREGORY ALEXANDER SAFRANYOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFRANYOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD GREGORY ALEXANDER SAFRANYOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFRANYOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990