THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Hiram St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056461221
Fax: 7056461271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 62621 )
Business Address: 169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C1
(705) 646-1221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 169 Hiram St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7056461221
Fax: 7056461271

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Sep 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Moran (CPSO#: 62621 )
Business Address: 169 Hiram Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C1
(705) 646-1221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEITH WILSON VALENTINE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEITH WILSON VALENTINE MORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990