THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 849 Upper Wentworth Street
Suite 300
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-3667
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kopyto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kopyto (CPSO#: 62641 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 300 - 849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 387-3667
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 849 Upper Wentworth Street
Suite 300
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-3667
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kopyto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kopyto (CPSO#: 62641 )
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 300 - 849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 387-3667
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN AUSTIN KOPYTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLAN AUSTIN KOPYTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPYTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990