THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:20:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 202
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-3666
Fax: (905) 639-6662
Address: Burlington Family Health Group
After Hours Walk-In Clinic
2025 Guelph line
Burlington Ontario L7P 4M8
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Fax: (905) 333-1960
Address: 2224 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6P 1P8
Phone: 519 652 2780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KIM IRELAND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ireland (CPSO#: 62671 )
Business Address: 202-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
(905) 639-3666

Corporation Name: Dr. Kim Ireland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 202
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-3666
Fax: (905) 639-6662
Address: Burlington Family Health Group
After Hours Walk-In Clinic
2025 Guelph line
Burlington Ontario L7P 4M8
Phone: (905) 681-7755
Fax: (905) 333-1960
Address: 2224 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6P 1P8
Phone: 519 652 2780
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KIM IRELAND MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ireland (CPSO#: 62671 )
Business Address: 202-3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
(905) 639-3666

Corporation Name: Dr. Kim Ireland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM LENORE IRELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRELAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM LENORE IRELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IRELAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990