THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:02:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8023

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Raymer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raymer (CPSO#: 62690 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0217 Extn: 46698
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-0271
Extension: 46698
Fax: (905) 577-8023

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Raymer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Raymer (CPSO#: 62690 )
Business Address: Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-0217 Extn: 46698
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ELISE RAYMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN ELISE RAYMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990