THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:21:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 618-0098
Fax: (905) 618-0100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Sayal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sayal (CPSO#: 62696 )
Business Address: Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 618-0098

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 618-0098
Fax: (905) 618-0100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. K. Sayal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sayal (CPSO#: 62696 )
Business Address: Suite 319
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
(905) 618-0098

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR SAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANOJ KUMAR SAYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990