THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 12:50:01 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-5780
Fax: (705) 728-8371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Tanton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tanton (CPSO#: 62711 )
Business Address: Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
(705) 728-5780

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-5780
Fax: (705) 728-8371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Tanton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tanton (CPSO#: 62711 )
Business Address: Suite 101
49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
(705) 728-5780

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LEWIS TANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT LEWIS TANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990