THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:25:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-7763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martina Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir (CPSO#: 62725 )
Business Address: 632 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S3
(905) 668-5851
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 600 Oshawa Boulevard North
Oshawa Ontario L1T 5T9
(905) 579-3313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-7763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health Whitby Site Whitby
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Clarington Site
LOCATION: Bowmanville

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Whitby Site
LOCATION: Whitby

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martina Weir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weir (CPSO#: 62725 )
Business Address: 632 Dundas Street West
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S3
(905) 668-5851
Business Address: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711
Business Address: 600 Oshawa Boulevard North
Oshawa Ontario L1T 5T9
(905) 579-3313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA JUNE EGAN WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTINA JUNE EGAN WEIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1990