THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:30:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Ossington Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-422-6641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tucker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tucker (CPSO#: 62735 )
Business Address: POBox 59065 - 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa ON K1G 5T7
613-422-6641
Business Address: A-114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 0X1
Business Address: 1500 Bank Street
Suite 316
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z2
(613) 422-6641
Business Address: 1400 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 79 Ossington Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-422-6641
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tucker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tucker (CPSO#: 62735 )
Business Address: POBox 59065 - 1559 Alta Vista Dr
Ottawa ON K1G 5T7
613-422-6641
Business Address: A-114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1S 0X1
Business Address: 1500 Bank Street
Suite 316
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7Z2
(613) 422-6641
Business Address: 1400 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LORRAINE TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LORRAINE TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990