THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J 7C3
Tel: 705-743-2040
Date Received: 06 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SUDHIR PANDYA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pandya (CPSO#: 62782 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Sudhir Pandya Medicine Professional Coporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SWAHILI
Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact:
Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough, ON
K9J 7C3
Tel: 705-743-2040
Date Received: 06 Feb 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SUDHIR PANDYA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pandya (CPSO#: 62782 )

Corporation Name: Dr. Sudhir Pandya Medicine Professional Coporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Apr 2011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR PRATAPRAI PANDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDYA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR PRATAPRAI PANDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDYA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nairobi, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1990