THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:22:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medicine
Suites M1857, Box 206
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8755
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Knoll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knoll (CPSO#: 62810 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 515
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82536

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medicine
Suites M1857, Box 206
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8755
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Greg Knoll Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knoll (CPSO#: 62810 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Room 515
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 738-8400 Extn: 82536

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ALAN KNOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOLL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ALAN KNOLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNOLL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1990