THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:27:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liege, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
Address: Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster On.
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: 905-304-0062
Fax: 905 304-0058
Address: 10 Cotrelle Blvd Suite 207
Brampton Ontario L6S0E2
Phone: 905 794 4497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2227 South Millway. Suite 303
Mississauga ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5L3R6
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: 905 569 7056
Address: 1315. Finch Avenue W. #302
North York Ontario M3J2G5
Phone: 416 634 0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Hannover Drive
St. Catherines Ontario
L2w1a3
Dynamic Endoscopy
St. Catharines Ontario L2W1A3
Phone: 905-684-9999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles A. Paco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paco (CPSO#: 62927 )
Business Address: Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
(905) 304-0062
Business Address: 303 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
(905) 569-7007
Business Address: Provis Endoscopy Services
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
(905) 607-0022 Extn: 437
Business Address: 4 - 45 Hannover
St Catharines Ontario L2W 1A3
(905) 684-9999
Business Address: 207 - 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 794-4497

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Liege, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-607-0022
Fax: 905-607-0013
Address: Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster On.
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
Phone: 905-304-0062
Fax: 905 304-0058
Address: 10 Cotrelle Blvd Suite 207
Brampton Ontario L6S0E2
Phone: 905 794 4497
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2227 South Millway. Suite 303
Mississauga ontario
Mississauga Ontario L5L3R6
Phone: 905 569 7007
Fax: 905 569 7056
Address: 1315. Finch Avenue W. #302
North York Ontario M3J2G5
Phone: 416 634 0001
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 45 Hannover Drive
St. Catherines Ontario
L2w1a3
Dynamic Endoscopy
St. Catharines Ontario L2W1A3
Phone: 905-684-9999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles A. Paco Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Paco (CPSO#: 62927 )
Business Address: Ancaster Endoscopy
1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 3K9
(905) 304-0062
Business Address: 303 - 2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
(905) 569-7007
Business Address: Provis Endoscopy Services
202 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V7
(905) 607-0022 Extn: 437
Business Address: 4 - 45 Hannover
St Catharines Ontario L2W 1A3
(905) 684-9999
Business Address: 207 - 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 794-4497

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY PACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES ANTHONY PACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liege, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 1990