THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room C2212
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 761-4504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 03 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Agbi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Agbi (CPSO#: 62987 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Extn: 19611

Corporation Name: Charles Agbi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
Room C2212
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 761-4504

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 03 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Agbi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Agbi (CPSO#: 62987 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
6137985555 Extn: 19611

Corporation Name: Charles Agbi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES BABATUNDE AGBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGBI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHARLES BABATUNDE AGBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGBI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 1990