THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:06:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of London, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M7 610
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 282 1244
Fax: (416) 480-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 05 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan R. Moody Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moody (CPSO#: 63017 )
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M7 610
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4341

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of London, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M7 610
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 282 1244
Fax: (416) 480-5855

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 05 May 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 05 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan R. Moody Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moody (CPSO#: 63017 )
Business Address: Department of Medical Imaging
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M7 610
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4341

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN ROWLAND MOODY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. MOODY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. MOODY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN ROWLAND MOODY may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAL IMAGING, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. MOODY holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;
(2) Dr. MOODY may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);
(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,
(ii) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,
(iii) When Dr. MOODY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of London, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2006

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1990