THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:40:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN, SWATOW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2311 McNicoll Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163216679
Fax: 4162984672
Address: 3276 St Clare Ave E, Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1L1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Extension: 3665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabriel F.P. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan (CPSO#: 63033 )
Business Address: 2311 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5L3
(416) 321-6679

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN, SWATOW
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2311 McNicoll Ave
Scarborough ON M1V 5L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163216679
Fax: 4162984672
Address: 3276 St Clare Ave E, Scarborough
Scarborough Ontario M1L1W1
Phone: (416) 285-3666
Extension: 3665
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabriel F.P. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan (CPSO#: 63033 )
Business Address: 2311 McNicoll Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5L3
(416) 321-6679

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL FAI POND CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIEL FAI POND CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 13 May 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1990