THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Hale Rd
-same
Brampton ON L6W 3J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19059583545
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Punjabi University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Hale Rd
-same
Brampton ON L6W 3J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 19059583545
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UPNINDERJIT SINGH HARRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UPNINDERJIT SINGH HARRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On April 24, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Upninderjit Harrad:

1.  Harrad must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
2.  Harrad must not be within 50 metres of any place where he knows named persons live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be except for required court appearance.
3.  Harrad must not harass, molest, or physically interfere with named person.
4.  Harrad must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Charges

Upninderjit Harrad was charged with the following offences:

1.  Utter Threat to Cause Death or Bodily Harm, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Dangerous Operation of a Conveyance, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 320.13(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.  Mischief over $5,000, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 430(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  April 24, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Brampton, Ontario
Peel Regional Police

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Release Conditions

On April 24, 2024, the following Release Conditions were imposed on Upninderjit Harrad:

1.  Harrad must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with named persons.
2.  Harrad must not be within 50 metres of any place where he knows named persons live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows them to be except for required court appearance.
3.  Harrad must not harass, molest, or physically interfere with named person.
4.  Harrad must not possess any weapon(s) as defined by the Criminal Code.


Source: Other
Effective Date: 24 Apr 2024
Summary:
Charges

Upninderjit Harrad was charged with the following offences:

1.  Utter Threat to Cause Death or Bodily Harm, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2.  Dangerous Operation of a Conveyance, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 320.13(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3.  Mischief over $5,000, on or about April 22, 2024, contrary to section 430(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of Charge:  April 24, 2024 
Place of Charge:  Brampton, Ontario
Peel Regional Police

Training

Medical School: Punjabi University, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1990