THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:10:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 09 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Pierre Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Major (CPSO#: 63122 )
Business Address: 9053047334

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 09 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Pierre Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Major (CPSO#: 63122 )
Business Address: 9053047334

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE PAUL MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE PAUL MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1990