THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beth Vallieres Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vallieres (CPSO#: 63138 )
Business Address: Dunbar Family Practice
5 - 350 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7N7
(519) 624-8934
Business Address: 200 Stirling Macgregor Drive
Cambridge Ontario N1S 5B7
(519) 622-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beth Vallieres Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vallieres (CPSO#: 63138 )
Business Address: Dunbar Family Practice
5 - 350 Hespeler Road
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7N7
(519) 624-8934
Business Address: 200 Stirling Macgregor Drive
Cambridge Ontario N1S 5B7
(519) 622-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY BETH VALLIERES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALLIERES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY BETH VALLIERES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALLIERES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1990