THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:35:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 319-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-493-7571
Fax: 416-493-0851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Myron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Myron (CPSO#: 63203 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 319-1333 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-493-7571
Fax: 416-493-0851

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 26 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Myron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Myron (CPSO#: 63203 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP MARK BENJAMIN MYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP MARK BENJAMIN MYRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 1990