THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:48:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 119 Pine Street South
201
Timmins Ontario P4N 2K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052672373
Fax: 8332110459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arnold (CPSO#: 63206 )
Business Address: 201 - 119 Pine Street South
Timmins Ontario P4N 2K3
(705) 267-2373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 119 Pine Street South
201
Timmins Ontario P4N 2K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052672373
Fax: 8332110459

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Lady Dunn Health Centre
LOCATION: Wawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Arnold (CPSO#: 63206 )
Business Address: 201 - 119 Pine Street South
Timmins Ontario P4N 2K3
(705) 267-2373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1990