THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:01:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
P O Box 2007 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Extension: 2009
Fax: (519) 631-8842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris F. Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department Of Radiology
P O Box 2007 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2030
Extension: 2009
Fax: (519) 631-8842

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris F. Levin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS FRANK LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS FRANK LEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1990