THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:27:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 496-0488
Fax: (416) 496-9790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 May 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Shilletto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shilletto (CPSO#: 63213 )
Business Address: Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 496-0488

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 496-0488
Fax: (416) 496-9790

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 29 May 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Shilletto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Shilletto (CPSO#: 63213 )
Business Address: Suite 310
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
North York Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 496-0488

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM NICHOLAS SHILLETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILLETTO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEREK WILLIAM NICHOLAS SHILLETTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHILLETTO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Aug 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1990