THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:07:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward L. W. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chow (CPSO#: 63311 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4998

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiation Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward L. W. Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chow (CPSO#: 63311 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4998

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD LEUNG WONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDWARD LEUNG WONG CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 1991