THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:28:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto Rehab University Centre
Suite 7-141-2
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4502
Fax: (416) 597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Flannery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Flannery (CPSO#: 63328 )
Business Address: 550 University Avenue
Unit 7-141-2
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto Rehab University Centre
Suite 7-141-2
550 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4502
Fax: (416) 597-7074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Flannery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Flannery (CPSO#: 63328 )
Business Address: 550 University Avenue
Unit 7-141-2
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(416) 597-3422 Extn: 4500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS FLANNERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLANNERY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN FRANCIS FLANNERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FLANNERY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 1991