THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road
London Ontario N6J 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-5789
Fax: (519) 641-6245
Address: 711 Exter Road
London Ontario N6E 1L3
Phone: 519-641-5789
Fax: 519-641-6245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaac F. Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Isaac (CPSO#: 63357 )
Business Address: Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2L3
(519) 641-5789
Business Address: 711 Exeter Road
London Ontario N6E 1L3
(519) 626-1922 Extn: 256

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road
London Ontario N6J 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 641-5789
Fax: (519) 641-6245
Address: 711 Exter Road
London Ontario N6E 1L3
Phone: 519-641-5789
Fax: 519-641-6245

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaac F. Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Isaac (CPSO#: 63357 )
Business Address: Suite 100
231 Wharncliffe Road South
London Ontario N6J 2L3
(519) 641-5789
Business Address: 711 Exeter Road
London Ontario N6E 1L3
(519) 626-1922 Extn: 256

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC FAHIM ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISAAC FAHIM ISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 1991