THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 7-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 761-8212
Fax: (613) 737-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean M. Seely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seely (CPSO#: 63378 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 74041
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555 Extn: 78571
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
613-686-1904

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 7-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 761-8212
Fax: (613) 737-8957

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean M. Seely Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seely (CPSO#: 63378 )
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 74041
Business Address: Department of Radiology
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
613-798-5555 Extn: 78571
Business Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
613-686-1904

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MORAG SEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN MORAG SEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 1991