THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 155
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-4273
Fax: (613) 623-8269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Schriver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Schriver (CPSO#: 63394 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 155
346 John Street North
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 623-4273
Fax: (613) 623-8269

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christine Schriver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Schriver (CPSO#: 63394 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARGARET SCHRIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRIVER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARGARET SCHRIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHRIVER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 May 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 May 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 1991