THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:49:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: Tey, Sing Seng (Used Until: 25 Aug 1999)
Medical School: University of Malaya, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 48 Penwick Crescent
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-4607
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Tey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tey (CPSO#: 63402 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5B4
(905) 883-2110

General Information

Former Name: Tey, Sing Seng (Used Until: 25 Aug 1999)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Malaya, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 48 Penwick Crescent
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-4607
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andy Tey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tey (CPSO#: 63402 )
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 5B4
(905) 883-2110

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDY SING SENG TEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDY SING SENG TEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Malaya, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 1994
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1994
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1994

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1991