THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:27:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Abbotsford Regional Hospital
and Cancer Centre ICU
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford British Columbia V2S 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 851-4811
Fax: (604) 851-4812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Missouri
USA - Oregon

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Don G. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burke (CPSO#: 63407 )
Business Address: 32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford British Columbia V2S 0C2
(604) 861-4811
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Abbotsford Regional Hospital
and Cancer Centre ICU
32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford British Columbia V2S 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 851-4811
Fax: (604) 851-4812

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Missouri
USA - Oregon

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Don G. Burke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Burke (CPSO#: 63407 )
Business Address: 32900 Marshall Road
Abbotsford British Columbia V2S 0C2
(604) 861-4811
Business Address: Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 522-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DON GILBERT BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DON GILBERT BURKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 1991