THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Main Street
Room 123
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0151
Fax: (613) 632-1073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Chagnon Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chagnon (CPSO#: 63452 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 123 - 151 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
(613) 632-0151

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 151 Main Street
Room 123
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 632-0151
Fax: (613) 632-1073

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Luc Chagnon Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chagnon (CPSO#: 63452 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111
Business Address: 123 - 151 Main Street East
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 1A1
(613) 632-0151

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUC CHAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAGNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LUC CHAGNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAGNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 1991