THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidney Care Centre
Timmins & District Hospital
Suite L536
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-268-8067
Fax: 705-268-8066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Parmar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parmar (CPSO#: 63454 )
Business Address: L536 - 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 268-8067

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kidney Care Centre
Timmins & District Hospital
Suite L536
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-268-8067
Fax: 705-268-8066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 19 Sep 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Anson General Hospital
LOCATION: Iroquois Falls

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Parmar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parmar (CPSO#: 63454 )
Business Address: L536 - 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 268-8067

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALVINDER SINGH PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MALVINDER SINGH PARMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 1991