THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chong Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow (CPSO#: 63483 )
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Fax: (905) 848-0328

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chong Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow (CPSO#: 63483 )
Business Address: The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario
Mississauga Ontario L5G 3H5
(905) 278-7077
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHONG JOHN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHONG JOHN CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 19 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 1991