THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 711
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-0929
Fax: 416-929-8084

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manjula Jeyapragasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeyapragasan (CPSO#: 63494 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 711
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 929-0929
Fax: 416-929-8084

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manjula Jeyapragasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jeyapragasan (CPSO#: 63494 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANJULA JEYAPRAGASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYAPRAGASAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANJULA JEYAPRAGASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYAPRAGASAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Colombo, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991