THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 02:23:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1920 Ellesmere Road
Suite 309
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-0519
Fax: 647-689-7601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Peng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peng (CPSO#: 63505 )
Business Address: 309 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 289-0519
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Suite 2128
28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham Ontario L3P 5T7
(905) 294-4990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1920 Ellesmere Road
Suite 309
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-0519
Fax: 647-689-7601

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Peng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peng (CPSO#: 63505 )
Business Address: 309 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2V6
(416) 289-0519
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Suite 2128
28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham Ontario L3P 5T7
(905) 294-4990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL YUEN-MAN PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL YUEN-MAN PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991