THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:15:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Restore Hyperbarics
Unit 105
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: 905-848-0202
Fax: 905-273-9800
Address: Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 12 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Tarshis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tarshis (CPSO#: 63510 )
Business Address: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Restore Hyperbaric Oxygen and Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite 3M-200
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Address: 1000 Middlegate Rd
Restore Hyperbarics
Unit 105
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: 905-848-0202
Fax: 905-273-9800
Address: Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 12 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Tarshis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tarshis (CPSO#: 63510 )
Business Address: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Restore Hyperbaric Oxygen and Medical Centre
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite 3M-200
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100
Business Address: Suite 601
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 928-9511

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN CRAIG TARSHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARSHIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JORDAN CRAIG TARSHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARSHIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991